Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Gabby's Starlit HOPE
CC52659
9429043314980
Registered

Registration details

4/11/2015
March 31

Address for service

43 Record Street
Fitzroy
New Plymouth
4312

Charity's other details

021925911
gabbysstarlithope


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide random acts of kindness (RAK's) to sick children (especially cancer children) and their families and carers while in hospital.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Support the welfare of children & their families undergoing treatment for cancer or other medical conditions in hospital in NZ )

Other (please state)

(Child Health)

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Gabby's Starlit HOPE Trust consists of four trustees with one being a chairperson. The trust holds meetings on a six monthly basis and has monthly update reporting emails. The grants (Random Acts of Kindness) that are completed are inline with the purpose of the charity and if any grants do not fit the criteria the board has to be notified and this has to be approved. The charity relies on donations from individual and businesses within NZ.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 29/09/2023 $183,152 $172,886 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 9/10/2022 $159,214 $156,500 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 28/10/2021 $108,748 $114,193 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 22/06/2020 $128,687 $129,478 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 10/10/2019 $70,982 $74,670 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 1/11/2018 $45,906 $53,863 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 2/11/2017 $72,445 $68,014 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/11/2016 $34,471 $38,812 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Justin Marinovich Trustee 4/11/2015
Patrick Roland Devine Trustee 4/11/2015
Sarah Devine Trustee 4/11/2015
Jessica Devine Trustee 1/04/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jessica Devane Trustee 1/04/2016

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.