Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Apumoana Marae Charitable Trust
Apumoana Marae
CC52663
N/A
Deregistered
26/11/2024
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Apumoana Marae Charitable Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

14/10/2015
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 26/11/2024 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 14/10/2015

Address for service

PO Box 2065
Rotorua
3040
27 Tarawera Road
Lynmore
Rotorua
3010

Charity's other details

07 345 6629


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To maintain the marae facilities for the benefits of the descendants of Apumoana Marae.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Marae on reservation land

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public

Entity Structure

Committee Members - Bob Te Aonui (Chair) Catherine Koha (Secretary), Jodie Pukepuke (Treasurer), Dallas Te Aonui, Earia Kiel, Randal McMahon, Kera Noble, Rawiri Daniels, Elizabeth Te Aonui, Tania Kiel, Leonie McMahon, Tara Morrison

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 16/05/2022 $85,922 $78,258 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 6/05/2021 $64,252 $64,251 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/09/2020 24/10/2020 $98,237 $74,706 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/09/2019 4/09/2019 $90,451 $102,414 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 $132,093 $95,222 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 4/07/2017 $158,253 $76,098 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 4/07/2017 $50,943 $49,474 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrew Timoti Profile Secretary 9/03/2021
Lorraine Parker Trustee Chairman 9/03/2021
Jodie Pukepuke Treasurer 23/11/2020
Bernard Hornfeck Trustee 29/06/2003
Elizabeth Te Aonui Trustee 29/06/2003
Robert Te Aonui Trustee 29/06/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Donelle Timoti Profile Secretary 24/03/2021
Heidi Hinemoa Symon Treasurer 23/11/2020
Maria Oliver Chairperson 23/11/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/03/2021 NOC009
24/03/2021 NOC008
24/03/2021 NOC007
24/03/2021 NOC006
26/04/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents


Notices

Apumoana Marae Charitable Trust is a marae on Māori Reservation Land. The Māori Reservation Regulations 1994 require that where a reservation is a marae the trustees of the reservation shall draw up, in agreement with the beneficiaries of the marae, a charter for the reservation. A copy of the Apumoana Marae Charitable Trust charter is published below. This charter is not a part of the formal rules of the marae as required under s17(1)(c) of the Charities Act 2005

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.