pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Whanau Marama Parenting Limited
WMP
CC52721
9429031002035
Registered

Registration details

9/12/2015
March 31

Address for service

1807B Ngunguru Road
Ngunguru
0173

Charity's other details

0223416212
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/WhanauMaramaParenting/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Vision -We believe that parents have the power to transform our world for the better. Mission - To be a respected, dynamic organisation through developing and delivering high quality practical and effective parenting courses

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Parent Education Parenting Courses)

Education / training / research

Social services, Parent Education Parenting Courses

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

We are an adult education provider specializing in teaching practical skills and strategies that teach parents how to positively discipline their children without punishment. Our operating ours are Monday to Friday 9am - 5pm.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 13/04/2023 $67,080 $72,020
30/09/2022 30/05/2022 $68,381 $73,400
30/09/2021 26/08/2021 $76,023 $47,685
30/09/2020 17/04/2020 $85,833 $109,555
30/09/2019 28/08/2019 $261,082 $202,592
30/09/2018 18/06/2018 $236,876 $245,434
30/09/2017 29/11/2017 $228,818 $196,296
30/09/2016 30/09/2017 $228,818 $196,296

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Cissy Gu Director 29/11/2018
Edith Yi Ping Director 18/10/2018
Tamati Ihaka Director 27/07/2018
Cameron John Vos Director 14/08/2015
Daniel Te Whenua Walker Chairman 14/08/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Susan Goergina Heathwaite Secretary 27/05/2020
Marama Te Aue Wiramina Flavell Director on Whanau Marama Parenting 14/10/2017
Shayne Cole Wijohn Director on Whanau Marama Parenting Board 25/06/2017
Elizabeth Ann Cameron Director 2/05/2016
Tamati Maikara Ihaka Director 2/05/2016
Dayna Maree, Dawn Young Director 11/04/2016
Betty Bae Director 4/03/2016
Eunmi Kim Director 22/10/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/09/2018 NOC009
12/12/2017 NOC007
21/03/2017 NOC004
29/09/2016 NOC002
24/05/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents