Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Canterbury Muslim Community Trust
CMCT
CC52918
9429043241118
Registered

Registration details

25/11/2015
March 31

Address for service

c/- MG Hadfield Co Ltd
27 Straven Road
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

02885116242
https://www.facebook.com/cmctnz/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To build bridges both within the Muslim community and between Muslims and the wider NZ community

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides religious services / activities

Community development

Education / training / research, Social services, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation

Migrants / refugees

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 5/09/2024 $10,495 $52,451 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 30/10/2024 $61,205 $164,004 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 28/09/2022 $116,035 $53,695 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 20/12/2021 $178,575 $179,847 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 7/09/2020 $300,271 $442,717 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 5/09/2019 $381,838 $52,414 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 25/09/2018 $7,396 $7,709 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/09/2017 $24,715 $21,079 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 2/09/2016 $5,060 $4,860 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Huda-Addeana Binte Husaini Trustee 4/06/2024
Syed M Akramul Kabir Trustee 3/10/2023
Abdifatah Ibrahim Chair 4/08/2022
Dietce Kristine Apriani Treasurer 4/08/2022
Sarah Gulan Qader Trustee 4/08/2022
Nicholas Hill Trustee 5/10/2015
Cheryl Marie Ruqayya Sulaiman-Hill Trustee 5/09/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Robert Alexander Dewhirst Chairman 4/06/2024
Tanzeel Khan Trustee 4/06/2024
Sara Mousa Trustee 5/09/2023
Mazharuddin Syed Ahmed Trustee 1/08/2022
Ibrahim Mohamed Abdelhalim Trustee 20/10/2021
Sherif Tawfeek Trustee 20/10/2021
Osman Aweys Ahmed Trustee 1/08/2021
Ziyaad Shah Trustee 9/06/2021
Juliana Binte Osman Trustee 31/03/2021
Nishad Pullithodi Treasurer 31/03/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/03/2024 NOC014
3/10/2023 NOC013
3/05/2023 NOC011
27/09/2022 NOC009
21/12/2021 NOC008
25/09/2018 NOC004

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.