Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Roman Catholic Diocese of Christchurch - The Catholic Parish of Waimakariri Trust
CC53065
N/A
Registered

Registration details

31/03/2016
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 4544
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140
Cathedral House
Unit 2, 9 Washington Way
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03 3669869


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To Sanctify, to teach, to care for. This is done by: advancement of the religious, charitable, educational and other objectives and purposes of the parish.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Entity Structure

The entity is a trust and a registered charity.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 31/10/2023 30/10/2023 $449,720 $555,810 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $359,687 $491,193 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/12/2021 6/12/2021 $422,922 $564,469 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/01/2021 28/01/2021 $396,399 $519,336 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 29/07/2019 $370,832 $479,224 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 20/11/2018 $390,715 $469,022 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 22/08/2018 $384,252 $465,111 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 22/03/2018 $366,068 $491,883 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Do Nguyen Parish Priest 5/10/2023
The Roman Catholic Bishop of the Diocese of Christchurch Trustee 13/02/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Richard James Loughnan Trustee 13/02/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/04/2024 NOC010
23/02/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.