pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Catholic Parish of New Plymouth - Te Parihi Katorika ki Ngamotu
CC53100
N/A
Registered

Registration details

31/03/2016
September 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Catholic Parish of New Plymouth 31/03/2016
The Catholic Parish of New Plymouth - Te Parihi Katorika ki Ngamotu 7/04/2016

Address for service

PO Box 5279
Terrace End
Roslyn
Palmerston North
4441
106 Powderham Street
New Plymouth
4310

Charity's other details

06 757 3682


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1. worship God in joyous celebration of the Mass and sacraments 2. proclaim the Word of God to all people 3. witness the love and redemptive healing of Christ 4. serve those in need in both Church and society

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Religious activities

Social services

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

1. The clergy appointed by the Bishop of the Diocese of Palmerston North, is responsible for celebrating the liturgies, and, the spiritual well-being and pastoral care of all parishioners. 2. The Parish Finance Committee assists in the administration of all property. 3. The Parish Pastoral Council assists in promoting pastoral action in the Parish.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
15/05/2023 12/06/2023 $889,319 $837,975
31/03/2022 25/03/2022 $1,084,018 $801,601
31/03/2021 12/04/2021 $702,881 $978,486
31/05/2020 23/05/2020 $819,810 $859,088
31/03/2019 29/03/2019 $673,751 $644,982
31/03/2018 7/03/2018 $633,687 $684,647
31/03/2017 22/03/2017 $1,229,472 $692,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Lewis Adams Bishop 30/09/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Atcherley Dew Apostolic Administrator 30/09/2023
Charles Edward Drennan Bishop 4/10/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/10/2023 NOC013
19/11/2019 NOC008
7/04/2016 NOC002

Charity Documents