Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hawke's Bay Baitul Mokarram Masjid and Islamic Centre Trust
HBBMMICT
CC53260
9429043210633
Registered

Registration details

11/03/2016
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 500
Hastings
4156
205 Hastings Street South
Hastings 4122
Hastings
4122

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

HBBMMICT provides facilities for Muslims in the Hawkes Bay to practice Islam as enjoined by the Holy Quran and the Sunnah of the Prophet Mohammed PBUS and arrange programmes and provide education for Islamic development for the Muslim community and their children and promotes and develops understanding and co-operation between Muslims and Non Muslims.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Community development

Religious groups

Children / young people

Entity Structure

HBBMMICT has four Trustees that constitute its board of governance. HBBMMICT Elect a management committee which includes a Chair, Treasurer from the Trustees. HBMMICT employs an Imam to perform the prayers and education

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 18/08/2024 $31,968 $8,528 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 4/09/2023 $24,620 $13,816 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 27/09/2022 $50,899 $55,181 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 7/02/2022 $50,899 $55,181 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 19/12/2020 $17,299 $6,913 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 16/09/2019 $11,267 $4,439 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 1/10/2018 $9,102 $4,302 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 24/09/2017 $6,583 $6,190 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 26/09/2016 $17,593 $12,439 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mohammed Harun Chair of the Trust 19/05/2024
Michael Hikawera Timothy Naera Working Committee 19/08/2023
Ahmed Elwan Secretary of the Trust 4/12/2022
Mohammad Azharuddin Treasurer of the Trust 4/12/2022
Quazi Assaduzzaman Trustee 4/12/2022
Dewan Saiful Islam Working Committee 20/02/2022
Khandakar Jesmin Working Committee 20/02/2022
Labib Yeasami Mallick Working Committee 20/02/2022
Mahamed Ahmed Ali Working Committee 20/02/2022
Riaz Ali Working Committee 20/02/2022
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kulander Hussein Chair of the Trust 1/11/2023
Ahmed Elwan Secretary of the Trust 3/12/2022
Kulander Hussein Treasurer of the Trust 3/12/2022
Mohammad Azharuddin Chair of the Trust 3/12/2022
Quazi Assaduzzaman Trustee 3/12/2022
Marwaan Waja President 7/10/2021
Mohmad Azharuddin Jamaludin Saiyad Secretary 7/10/2021
Shimul Islam Treasurer 7/10/2021
Sanjeda Ahmed Trustee and Women's Representative 13/01/2020
Sayeed Ahmed Trustee 10/01/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/04/2025 NOC021
28/06/2024 NOC019
4/09/2023 NOC018
17/03/2023 NOC016
7/02/2022 NOC014
3/08/2020 NOC011
13/01/2020 NOC010
13/01/2020 NOC009
10/01/2020 NOC008
19/11/2019 NOC007
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.