Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Adarsh Satsang Ramayan Mandali Incorporated
Adarsh Satsang Ramayan Mandali
CC53315
9429043094950
Registered

Registration details

18/05/2016
December 31

Address for service

143 Harbourside Drive
Karaka
Papakura
2113
143 Harbourside Drive
Karaka 2113
Henderson
Karaka
2113

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/adarshsatsangmandali/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Mandali is committed to the advancement of Hindu religion and culture. The Mandali is committed to helping and supporting people and organizations in need. The Mandali is committed to assisting statutory departments and organizations involved in development of culture for the promotion of a multi-cultural organization in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Mandali is composed of members with the following roles: President, Vice President, Secretary, Treasurer, Assistant Secretary and Treasurer, Development Officers and ordinary Committee Members. The Mandali holds one Annual General Meeting each year and multiple General Meetings as required.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 13/03/2025 $7,645 $7,244 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 13/05/2024 $10,953 $6,368 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 24/04/2023 $6,710 $4,632 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 21/02/2022 $6,832 $5,805 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/03/2021 $4,858 $3,794 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 2/06/2020 $8,567 $7,227 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 2/03/2019 $9,049 $4,011 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 21/02/2018 $11,862 $5,240 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 2/02/2017 $8,610 $4,123 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Satya Dutt Founding Member 6/10/2024
Biren Prasad Committee Member 5/05/2019
Sumintra Dutt Development Officer 2/03/2019
Jai Narayan Committee Member 18/01/2016
Tara Prasad Patron 18/01/2016
Ashneel Ambedkar Committee Member 17/01/2016
Dinesh Prasad Secretary 17/01/2016
Naveen Kumar Vice President 17/01/2016
Rakesh Kumar Committee Member 17/01/2016
Rakesh Ram Treasurer 17/01/2016
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Roneil Dutt Development Officer 2/03/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/02/2025 NOC012
1/12/2023 NOC010
22/08/2019 NOC005
14/06/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.