Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Community Wireless Trust
CWT
CC53346
9429043158997
Registered

Registration details

29/04/2016
March 31

Address for service

7 Main Street
Fairlie
7925

Charity's other details

+642041222110
https://www.facebook.com/communitywirelesstrust/
https://twitter.com/communiwireless


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

It’s main purpose is to provide Digital Development to communities across New Zealand. Funds generated through subscriptions and donations, help with local educational, new digital initiatives and fund devices to enhance community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides wireless fibre services to subscribers and donates profits to community to develop the community and digital development )

Community development

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Family / whanau, Religious groups, Communities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 17/09/2024 $60,528 $67,043 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/11/2023 28/11/2023 $70,357 $133,954 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 31/10/2022 19/10/2022 $63,031 $64,709 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/10/2021 11/10/2021 $45,909 $31,821 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 27/09/2020 $69,224 $63,404 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/11/2019 26/11/2019 $73,834 $59,124 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 12/12/2018 $16,660 $25,020 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 31/10/2017 $24,722 $5,824 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Julie Simpson Trustee 1/07/2022
Mike Dooley Trustee 3/06/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rene Bullock Treasurer 1/09/2023
Matthew Robert Hampton Trustee 6/12/2022
Daniel Fleming Trustee 17/10/2022
Elliot Ball Trustee 17/10/2022
Mark Gilbert Williams Trustee 30/09/2021
Janelle Ann Bilcliffe Trustee 29/09/2021
Kereama Hori Williams Trustee 24/09/2019
Brian Williams Trustee 6/09/2019
John Richard O'Hanlon Trustee 24/08/2019
Mike Dooley Trustee 31/03/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/12/2023 NOC028
28/11/2023 NOC027
1/09/2023 NOC025
8/12/2022 NOC024
8/12/2022 NOC023
8/12/2022 NOC022
21/07/2022 NOC020
30/09/2021 NOC018
29/09/2021 NOC017
19/06/2021 NOC016
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.