pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


DeafBlind Association of New Zealand Charitable Trust
CC53793
9429043242832
Registered

Registration details

29/08/2016
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 263
Ashburton
7740
8 Park Street
Ashburton
7700

Charity's other details

0800 450 650


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advocate for people who have a dual sensory deafblind hearing and low vision loss disability and to coordinate appropriate resources and equal opportunities throughout New Zealand in accommodation, education, employment, further training, health, wellbeing, welfare, rehabilitation, respite, interpreter services, recreation/leisure and other support services for all those with a hearing and vision impairment loss.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

To recognise the need for a charity enabling all deafblind to achieve a healthy, safe, happy quality of life and allowing them to reach their potential by way of advocacy and support.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 28/12/2021 $91,989 $102,675
30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $78,099 $64,139
30/09/2019 15/10/2019 $92,176 $52,402
30/09/2018 5/10/2018 $30,513 $39,240
30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $46,610 $17,830

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 15 months from 1 April 2020 to 30 June 2021.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Vaughan Dodd Chairperson 31/10/2020
Kevin Prince Trustee 27/07/2017
Donald McKenzie Trustee 3/05/2017
Lynda Stevenson Trustee 3/05/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Georgina McLeod Trustee 31/05/2021
David Wilson Chairperson 31/10/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/01/2021 NOC007
9/08/2017 NOC002
28/07/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents