Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


EmpowermentNZ
The Hub Te Puke
CC53812
9429043309955
Registered

Registration details

20/10/2016
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 129
Te Puke
3153
32 Jocelyn Street
Te Puke 3119
Te Puke
3119

Charity's other details

079751057
thehubtepuke


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

EmpowermentNZ was established in 2016 by a group of local people who identified gaps within Te Puke social services - providing access to community social work, financial mentoring, counselling, programmes and connection. Our purpose is to: • offer relief through access to essential items, food and facilities; • create a welcoming and safe space for the community where belonging fosters and strengthens relationships; • facilitate active participation in decision-making, partnering with people to encourage positive outcomes and promote positive social change; • provide opportunities for people to develop knowledge and skills for future success; • to work with other organisations working towards similar ends. The Trust is committed to attaining its purposes to support the community to thrive by: • helping people in need; • honouring the spirit of the Treaty of Waitangi; • promoting relationship, belonging and connectivity; • respecting diversity and encouraging all people.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

General public

Entity Structure

EmpowermentNZ is a non-profit registered charitable trust with four (4) trustees. Trustees are selected for their business, community and social service skill sets. Sue Wilks, Lee Harrison, Clyde Langford (chair), and Patrick Rounds are current trustees. Along with the four (4) trustees, we have one (1) F/T manager, seven (9) part-time staff and an additional twelve (12) volunteers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 3/10/2024 $1,023,417 $991,795 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 18/09/2023 $758,917 $755,127 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 12/10/2022 $681,399 $560,480 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 19/10/2021 $419,475 $432,041 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 12/10/2020 $337,693 $333,596 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 28/11/2019 $197,130 $183,038 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 20/12/2018 $84,598 $102,334 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 28/02/2018 26/02/2018 $31,858 $10,348 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jacob Kennedy McBride Trustee 1/10/2024
Levi Ricky Smith Trustee 1/10/2024
Berendje Ardina Hamblyn Trustee 13/08/2024
Louisa Westerlund Trustee 13/08/2024
Stephen David Mann Trustee 13/08/2024
Lee John Harrison Trustee 1/11/2020
Patrick Rounds Trustee 14/09/2020
Susan Blair Wilks Trustee 1/07/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Clyde Arthur Langford Trustee 13/08/2024
Victoria Louisa McNeill Trustee 13/09/2021
Judith Mary Abrahams Trustee 1/10/2020
Maurice James Ritchie Trustee 14/09/2020
Deborah Ruth Nicol Trustee 20/07/2018
Roger Neils Wilks Trustee 1/09/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/08/2024 NOC013
3/10/2023 NOC012
11/08/2023 NOC010
13/10/2020 NOC007
18/10/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.