Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Chiasma Incorporated
CC53816
9429043290239
Registered

Registration details

26/09/2016
October 31

Address for service

40 Main Highway
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Chiasma Inc is a charitable incorporated society that supports student-led and student-run teams that aims to encourage science entrepreneurship and innovation among tertiary students, to contribute to the growth of the knowledge-based economy and to provide employment skills for science students.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Employment, Economic development

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Our Society currently has four regional branches - Auckland, Wellington, Dunedin and Manawatū. Each branch has three executive positions; CEO, COO and CFO. All branches are overseen by the national organisation, which has two executive positions, CEO/General Manager and CFO/Treasurer. Each branch has a regional steering committee of key supporters, which provides direction and guidance.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/10/2024 20/04/2025 30/04/2025 $16,452 $28,480 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2023 30/04/2024 30/04/2024 $35,329 $38,100 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2023 $33,304 $45,621 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2021 30/04/2022 18/04/2022 $43,506 $40,630 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2020 30/04/2021 28/04/2021 $36,541 $25,731 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/11/2019 31/05/2020 27/04/2020 $48,990 $46,980 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/11/2018 31/05/2019 14/02/2019 $63,511 $66,765 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/11/2017 31/05/2018 3/07/2018 $78,255 $65,329 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/11/2016 31/05/2017 10/05/2017 $60,253 $53,986 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bridget Lamont CEO 1/01/2023
Lillian Kuan CFO 2/03/2020
Hasanthi Kaushala Ratnayake Advisor 1/01/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bradley Hosking CEO 31/12/2022
Amy Lee CFO 31/12/2021
Rory Besaans CEO 31/12/2021
Sheree Clifton Chief Financial Officer 28/02/2020
Imche Fourie Chief Executive Officer 30/08/2019
Laura Jane Blake Relations Manager 31/12/2018
Maria Jose Alvarez Business Development Manager 31/12/2018
Matthew William Lloyd Partnerships Manager 31/12/2017
Nikita Bartlett Chief Financial Officer 31/12/2017
Stefan Prodan Partnerships Manager 31/12/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/04/2022 NOC012
18/04/2022 NOC010
24/04/2021 NOC008
13/03/2020 NOC006
7/05/2019 NOC005
14/03/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.