pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Acacia Ministries
Acacia Projects
CC54139
9429043311880
Registered

Registration details

21/12/2016
March 31

Address for service

72 Cherry Drive
Mosgiel
Dunedin
9024

Charity's other details

034847333


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of Acacia Ministries is to further the gospel of Jesus Christ by creating quality biblical teaching and resources for effective discipleship and spiritual growth. It aims to promote love and leadership within NZ, to equip people to serve their communities in love and to alleviate poverty and suffering.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Social services, International activities

Religious groups

General public

Entity Structure

Acacia Ministies is being run as a charitable trust with a trust board consisting of five trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 23/08/2022 $54,960 $58,895
30/09/2021 19/09/2021 $314,668 $313,586
30/09/2020 12/07/2020 $229,186 $215,334
30/09/2019 13/09/2019 $82,359 $73,586
30/09/2018 7/05/2018 $41,463 $42,666
30/09/2017 7/07/2017 $11,725 $5,497

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Donald Lewis Trustee 8/03/2020
Nikki Joy Miller Trustee 21/12/2016
Geoff Woodcock Chief Executive Officer 8/04/2016
Donna Lee Nichol Trustee 13/03/2016
Geoffrey Robert Kemp Trustee 13/03/2016
Maria Bridgette Kemp Trustee 13/03/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/06/2022 NOC010
23/03/2021 NOC008
14/06/2020 NOC006
13/03/2020 NOC005
13/03/2020 NOC004

Charity Documents