Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Upper Hutt Housing Charitable Trust
Homai te Whaiora
CC54166
9429043310449
Registered

Registration details

5/12/2016
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Upper Hutt Housing Trust 5/12/2016
Upper Hutt Housing Charitable Trust 1/12/2022

Address for service

95b Main Street
Upper Hutt
5018

Charity's other details

049707169
Upper Hutt Housing Trust - Homai te Whaiora


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To respond to the housing needs of people living in and around Upper Hutt so they have access to suitable, sustainable accommodation.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Accommodation / housing

General public

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

We are an incorporated Charitable Trust based in Upper Hutt. Our rules state that we must have 6-12 trustees. Currently we have 6 trustees. Trustees come from Christian churches of Upper Hutt. The Settlors are Teresa Homan and Judith Dixon who are members of St Josephs Justice and Peace Group who instigated this trust. Teresa is the Chairperson and Judith is Secretary

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 31/12/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 19/10/2022 $927,573 $874,595 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $838,996 $830,601 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $733,490 $708,622 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 19/09/2019 $373,574 $278,946 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 22/09/2018 $61,628 $53,627 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 26/10/2017 $755 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ufilei Agatha Solia Trustee 14/09/2023
Nigel Lance Mander Trustee 10/08/2023
Joanne Cherie Blain Trustee 9/02/2023
Jane Mary Braun Trustee 12/05/2022
Michael Stennett Hurle Trustee 5/07/2018
Colin Douglas Lewis Trustee 26/10/2017
Teresa Jane Homan Chairperson of the Trust 21/12/2016
Judith Carol Dixon Secretary 21/08/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nigel Lance Mander Trustee 12/12/2022
Rosemary Taylor Trustee 31/01/2022
Aidan Sacheverell Tansell Trustee 20/08/2021
Noelene Kathleen Casey Trustee 17/03/2020
Nova Ruth Kotuku Mercier Trustee 13/02/2020
Joanne Cherie Blain Treasurer 10/10/2019
William John Kirkup Trustee 16/08/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/10/2023 NOC014
12/05/2023 NOC013
11/02/2023 NOC012
30/11/2022 NOC011
26/08/2022 NOC009
23/08/2021 NOC007
23/11/2017 NOC003
27/08/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.