pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Our Seas Our Future Charitable Trust
Our Seas Our Future, OSOF
CC54180
9429043308590
Registered

Registration details

10/08/2016
June 30

Address for service

43 Campbells Road
Pine Hill
Dunedin
9010

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/OurSeasOurFuture
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/oneoceanlove
https://www.linkedin.com/company/6402300


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Seas Our Future (OSOF) aims to protect New Zealand’s coastal and marine ecosystems through advocacy, education, and environmental stewardship, ensuring that they are managed sustainably and protected for future generations.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Education and Services)

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

OSOF is a non-profit marine conservation organisation with a nationwide focus. OSOF currently operates as a volunteer driven initiative, focusing on coastal and marine conservation, environmental education, and community engagement projects. OSOF is active nationwide.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 1/01/2023 $8,193 $1,303
31/12/2021 12/01/2022 $6,006 $2,904
31/12/2020 31/12/2020 $13,592 $6,564
31/12/2019 11/10/2019 $6,431 $3,294
31/12/2018 3/09/2018 $2,483 $41
31/01/2018 21/01/2018 $317 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kate Marie Sparks Trustee 24/07/2023
Finley Robert John Duncan Trustee 28/06/2023
Madison Rebecca Walker Trustee 15/05/2023
Joanne Michele Bailey Trustee 22/11/2022
Andrew Blewden Trustee 7/06/2022
Myles Snaddon Trustee 7/06/2022
Noel Jhinku Trustee 29/07/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kristina Price Trustee 6/06/2023
Janice ChiFen Huang Trustee 15/05/2023
Samuel Nicholas Henry Marsh Trustee 24/03/2023
Jane Catherine Barron Trustee 23/03/2022
Gregory Paul Nelson Trustee 22/03/2022
George Alan Daniel Paul Connolly Trustee 3/03/2022
Megan Joyce Blakie Trustee 24/08/2021
Hannah Charlotte Checkley Trustee 31/05/2021
Maarten Magielse Trustee 31/05/2021
William Claude Meadows Trustee 31/05/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/07/2023 NOC042
13/07/2023 NOC040
13/06/2023 NOC038
7/06/2023 NOC037
30/05/2023 NOC036
3/04/2023 NOC035
1/12/2022 NOC033
1/12/2022 NOC032
27/06/2022 NOC031
22/06/2022 NOC030

Charity Documents