Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mountains to Sea Wellington Trust
CC54455
9429046128645
Registered

Registration details

11/05/2017
June 30

Address for service

43B Herewini Street
Titahi Bay
Porirua
5022

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/mountainstoseawellington/
https://www.instagram.com/mountainstoseawellington/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

MTSW Wellington's purpose is to inspire kaitiakitanga (guardianship ) for our rivers, harbours and coast. We do this by (i) providing inspiring education for the environment. (ii) supporting students and their communities to develop the skills and knowledge required to act as guardians for their local environment and community. (iii) developing tools and resources to support environmental projects, citizen science and enhanced collaboration.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Environmental education programmes Community Science Environmental Restoration)

Education / training / research

Children / young people

General public

Entity Structure

Our trust is currently comprised of six Trustees that constitute our governance board, including three executive positions: Chairperson, Treasurer and Secretary. We have a delivery agreement with the national Mountains to Sea Conservation Trust for the EMR, WBC and HHP programmes. The MTSCT provides guidance and support, but does not control or in anyway direct our regional operations.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 20/11/2024 $2,081,997 $1,762,418 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 16/11/2023 $1,065,039 $1,006,882 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 22/12/2022 $633,507 $634,076 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 16/12/2021 $374,414 $361,557 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 13/11/2020 $359,147 $364,445 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 18/12/2019 $337,490 $307,309 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 1/10/2018 $242,242 $241,493 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Morgan Watkins Officer 25/05/2022
Pamela Mary Freeman Treasurer 26/11/2019
Maureen Cecelia Hickey Chairperson 2/10/2018
Nicholas Churchouse Officer 25/05/2017
Sarah Rebecca Neighbours Officer 9/05/2017
Zoe Felicity Studd Officer 9/05/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alison Anitawaru Cole Trustee 22/11/2021
Ellan Kay Young Officer 27/11/2019
Emily Watt Treasurer 12/02/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/12/2021 NOC015
21/04/2021 NOC013
6/07/2020 NOC011
6/07/2020 NOC010
18/12/2019 NOC008
12/06/2019 NOC007
1/09/2017 NOC004
20/06/2017 NOC002
20/06/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.