Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The UnderDogs Foundation
CC54581
N/A
Registered

Registration details

7/05/2017
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 416
Orewa
0946
127 Bayer Road
RD 1
Puhoi
Silverdale
0994

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The UnderDogs Foundation is a charitable and philanthropic organisation based in Auckland, New Zealand. Its charitable purpose is to raise money to provide funding to local charities and services across NZ where funds will be used to elevate and enrich the lives of dogs, and humans - through dogs, exclusively in Aotearoa, New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Care / protection of animals

Fund-raising

Animals

Other charities, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Our headquarters is based in Auckland. We currently have two Trustees that constitute our governance board. We are affiliated with a social enterprise, The Dog Share Collective, which generates revenue and support but does not control or in any way direct our operations.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 25/03/2024 $313 $313 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 19/08/2022 $281 $598 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 12/08/2022 $1,294 $1,240 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 26/09/2020 $2,094 $1,714 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 6/08/2019 $214 $52 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 9/08/2018 $1,925 $1,924 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jacqueline Ann Johnson Trustee 24/04/2017
Sandra Dorothy Mary Walker Settlor and Trustee 24/04/2017

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.