pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Brave, Eager and Determined (BREAD) Charitable Trust
Bread Charity
CC54738
9429046204554
Registered

Registration details

10/07/2017
March 31

Address for service

79A Orakei Road
Remuera
Auckland
1050

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Bread is a charity which assists children in low decile Auckland schools. We aim to revolutionise the charity space by providing the highest possible quality of mentoring and provision of school gear for these students. Our goal is simple. To protect the dreams of our youth.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Fund-raising

Children / young people

Entity Structure

We are based in Auckland with our trust deed stating we must have at least one trustee (currently have 3)

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 22/09/2020 $23,147 $18,799
30/09/2019 26/09/2019 $30,384 $12,587
30/09/2018 3/09/2018 $11,463 $7,316

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hamish Wu Co-founding Trustee 10/07/2017
Mustafa Sheikh Founding Trustee 7/06/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Crystal Wu Trustee 13/09/2021
Neil Brent Inns Trustee 11/04/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/05/2021 NOC005
25/09/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents