pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Whakatipu Wildlife Trust
CC54794
9429046225825
Registered

Registration details

14/07/2017
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Wakatipu Wildlife Trust 22/09/2017
Whakatipu Wildlife Trust 8/09/2021

Address for service

PO Box 690
Queenstown
9348
60 Cunninghams Drive
Jacks Point 9371
Jacks Point
9371

Charity's other details

0272201188
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/WakatipuWildlifeTrust


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Encouraging the establishment of a network of projects designed to make the greater Lake Wakatipu area predator free and thus enable birds and other native wildlife to flourish.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

We are based in Queenstown and our focus is on acting as an umbrella organisation supporting localised predator elimination groups through out the greater Lake Wakatipu region. We have seven trustees as per our Trust Deed and they carry out the work of the Trust. We also additionally have a chartered accountant as treasurer.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/10/2021 26/10/2021 $106,097 $74,584
31/10/2020 29/10/2020 $151,018 $96,030
31/10/2019 30/10/2019 $93,598 $73,653
30/11/2018 26/11/2018 $44,598 $13,359

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Daniel Vincent John Sweeney Trustee 29/11/2020
Nicky Jane Gray Trustee 29/11/2020
Dawn Alice Palmer Trustee 29/10/2020
David John Penrose Trustee 25/10/2018
Philip James Green Trustee 25/10/2018
Benjamin Ivan Perchik Trustee 2/06/2017
Penelope Jane Clark Trustee 2/06/2017
Philippa Jane Speedy Trustee 2/06/2017
Warren Richard Skerrett Trustee 2/06/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Paul Brendan Kavanagh Trustee 11/10/2021
Thomas McNeil Pryde Trustee 6/08/2021
Paul Alexis Griffin Trustee 25/10/2018
Wulf Solter Trustee 25/10/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/10/2021 NOC009
8/09/2021 NOC008
27/07/2021 NOC007
4/11/2020 NOC006
3/12/2018 NOC003

Charity Documents