pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Guardians of Kāpiti Marine Reserve Trust
CC54807
9429046128669
Registered

Registration details

6/09/2017
March 31

Address for service

111 Riwai Street
Paraparaumu
5032

Charity's other details

0221974100
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/groups/GOKMR/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Advance and promote the conservation and protection of the Kāpiti Marine Reserve and surrounding marine environment for the benefit of the local community now and for future generations by supporting marine conservation education, research and advocacy initiatives that engage and inform the local community about Kāpiti marine reserve and provide them with opportunities to act as Kaitiaki, to connect with, take pride in and ownership of their local marine environment.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research

General public

Animals

Entity Structure

We currently have 10 trustees that constitute our governance board including 2 executive positions: Chair, and Treasurer. Our trust deed rules require a minimum of 4 trustees and a maximum of 10. We have a facebook group with a membership of nearly 1300 marine users, recreational and commercial fishers, boaties, divers, marine scientists, educators, conservationists and other members of the local community with an interest in the Kapiti marine space.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 21/08/2022 $1,025 $4,220
30/09/2021 20/11/2021 $34,597 $2,530
31/10/2020 31/10/2020 $8,250 $51
30/11/2019 18/11/2019 $14,707 $4,378
30/09/2018 27/09/2018 $20,348 $4,045

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Martin Halliday Trustee 23/07/2020
Jean Fleming Trustee 4/10/2018
Jonathan Gardner Trustee 27/08/2017
Angela Buswell Trustee 27/04/2017
Chris Paulin Trustee 27/04/2017
Jack Hampton Trustee 27/04/2017
Karl Webber Trustee 27/04/2017
Ben Knight Chair, Treasurer 3/04/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bianca Begovich Trustee 30/04/2022
Steve Anderton Trustee 11/02/2022
Janet Holborow Trustee 16/07/2020
Jordan Aria Housiaux Trustee 30/05/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/02/2022 NOC007
17/11/2018 NOC003
6/06/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents