pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


TimeOut Charitable Trust
CC55084
9429046338440
Registered

Registration details

29/09/2017
March 31

Address for service

21 Woodlands Crescent
Browns Bay
Auckland
0630

Charity's other details

0211101671
Facebook icon image
timeoutnz.org


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote and facilitate the provision of holiday accommodation to the terminally ill and their families. To also provide information and resources to the terminally ill to help aid them and their families.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

People with disabilities

Health, Social services

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Out trust deed states that we must have between three and eight trustees. We currently have five trustees who constitute our governance board.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 30/08/2021 $63,117 $32,500
30/09/2020 18/08/2020 $1,667 $17,491
30/09/2019 3/10/2019 $25,700 $381
30/09/2018 1/12/2018 $3,000 $40

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jane Dorothy Greville Trustee 30/08/2021
Douglas Ludbrook Hanna Trustee 9/03/2018
Roimata Maariuooterangi Ness Trustee 29/09/2017
Ronda Louis Amende Trustee 29/09/2017
Hamish Braddick Trustee 8/07/2017
Joshua Luke Saba Shaw Trustee 8/07/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sarah Celese Howard Trustee 12/03/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/08/2020 NOC008
1/10/2019 NOC006
10/04/2018 NOC003
18/01/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents