Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Gale Force Gospel Choir Incorporated
CC55180
9429043293490
Registered

Registration details

10/11/2017
December 31

Address for service

388 Makara Road
RD 2
Makara
Karori
6972

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/GaleForceGospelChoir/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Objects of the Choir are to be beneficial to the community by: - promoting educational and community activities through singing primarily gospel related songs; and - developing opportunities for friendship, companionship, mutual support and reduction of social isolation through the mutual activity of singing; and - being inclusive and accessible to everyone who would like to sing with us, regardless of gender, ethnicity, musical ability or religious identity.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

A Core Group manages the affairs of the choir. Core GRoup members are elected each year at the AGM. Our constitution requires the Core Group to have a minimum of 5 and a maximum of 8 members. The Music Director is appointed to the Core Group ex-officio, with voting rights. The Core Group elects the Chair, the Secretary and the Treasurer. The Core Group has the power to appoint extra or replacement Core Group members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 22/05/2023 $17,556 $18,894 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 21/06/2022 $17,752 $20,509 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2021 $23,051 $19,262 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/09/2020 16/12/2020 $31,484 $35,725 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 31/07/2019 30/07/2019 $24,470 $20,708 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 3/07/2018 $28,225 $27,411 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Richard Hale Treasurer 1/05/2023
Judy Pickering Secretary 31/10/2022
Judith Shearer Chair 1/08/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kath May Treasurer 30/05/2023
Jim Maurice Coyle Chair 3/04/2023
Amanda Gyles Core Group Member 2/11/2022
Benjamin Ross Woods Music Director 2/11/2022
Helen Gilbert Treasurer 31/10/2022
Peter Donal O'Driscoll Secretary 31/10/2022
Andrew Thompson-Davies Chair 30/04/2022
Susan Gail Sutherland Secretary 30/04/2022
Rachel Catherine MacLeod Core Group Member 1/03/2022
Donald Murray Mackay Treasurer 5/07/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/05/2023 NOC019
23/05/2023 NOC018
23/05/2023 NOC017
3/11/2022 NOC015
2/11/2022 NOC014
22/06/2022 NOC012
2/08/2021 NOC011
2/08/2021 NOC010
1/08/2021 NOC009
3/06/2021 NOC007
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.