Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Poverty Free Aotearoa
CC55237
9429046379146
Registered

Registration details

9/03/2018
March 31

Address for service

76A Rahwiti Road
Pukerua Bay
Porirua
5026

Charity's other details

0272399734


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust is to provided resources to support individuals and non- profit organisations engaged in community based programmes and activities which seek to address te needs of low income people, beneficiaries, students, the homeless and others experiencing poverty in Aotearoe/New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Social services

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2018 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 1/11/2024 $0 $2,131 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 28/02/2024 $10,000 $7,500 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 3/04/2024 $1,100 $1,241 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 5/08/2021 $1,100 $1,241 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 27/05/2020 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 29/08/2019 $7,300 $6,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Conor Twyford Trustee 29/07/2021
Margaret Ann Stevenson Trustee 29/07/2021
Rosita Louise Gallen Trustee 29/07/2021
Roger John Harris Trustee, Chair 9/03/2018
Sophia Leila Jill Beatson Trustee 10/07/2017
Syd John Keepa Trustee 10/07/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Avril Stott Trustee 31/07/2021
Sarah Jane Thompson Trustee 6/12/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/08/2021 NOC006
28/07/2021 NOC004
30/11/2020 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.