pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Duncan Foundation
CC55313
9429047837966
Registered

Registration details

27/11/2017
March 31

Address for service

72 Sarsfield Street
Herne Bay
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details

0274319994
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/theduncanfoundation/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To support or establish a number of clinics in New Zealand that have the capacity to assess people throughout the country who have or have had neurological conditions for the purpose of guiding rehabilitation and ongoing support To develop and support on an ongoing basis, any other activities related to a neurological condition

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

People with disabilities

General public

Entity Structure

The Trustees are as follows: Joe Duncan, Company Director, Sally Paterson, PR, Marketing and Communications Specialist and Julie Rope, Physiotherapist and Tim Edmond, CEO WellFoundation,all of Auckland. The CEO is Gordon Jackman

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 14/09/2021 $263,930 $295,410
30/09/2020 10/07/2020 $310,976 $233,883
30/09/2019 25/08/2019 $201,767 $202,877

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joe Duncan Trustee 1/11/2017
Sally Margaret Paterson Trustee 1/11/2017
Timothy Edwin Edmonds Trustee 1/11/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gordon Heathcote Jackman CEO 16/04/2021
Julie Louise Rope Trustee 1/04/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/04/2021 NOC004
18/02/2021 NOC003

Charity Documents