Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sustainable Queenstown Charitable Trust
CC55448
9429046762405
Registered

Registration details

28/05/2018
June 30

Address for service

Todd and Walker Law
Level 2 Craigs Investment Partners House
5 Mile Centre, 36 Grant Road
Queenstown
9371

Charity's other details

0277025877
https://www.facebook.com/sustainableQueenstown/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust's charitable purpose is to be beneficial to the communities in the Queenstown Lakes District, Aotearoa/New Zealand (the "District") by promoting and strengthening Sustainability through community led engagement on issues affecting the District's environment, economy and culture with environmental Sustainability as the defining input and output. OUR VISION: Our vision is to support and empower the Queenstown community to make better decisions when it comes to their sustainable practices every single day. Together we strive to create a more sustainable home for our community to live, work and play.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Environment / conservation

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 8/12/2024 $93,880 $108,742 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 27/12/2023 $69,249 $73,674 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 12/12/2022 $27,186 $28,531 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 1/03/2022 $33,357 $40,883 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 15/12/2020 $38,256 $35,253 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 17/12/2019 $50,116 $14,554 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Cristina Barraclough Trustee 29/01/2025
Jade Baker-Edwards Trustee 29/01/2025
Catherine Margaret Jackson Trustee 5/04/2024
Micaela McLeod Trustee 21/09/2023
Lucy Deuble Trustee 1/12/2021
Lana Cruickshank Trustee 1/06/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Isabelle Prosser Trustee 17/10/2024
Peter Harris Trustee 8/04/2024
James Cummins Trustee 27/02/2024
Portia Thompson Trustee 1/11/2023
Greg Nelson Trustee 7/07/2023
Tara Strahan Trustee 28/01/2023
Russell King Trustee 25/01/2023
Ella Zhang Trustee 28/07/2022
Selina Pearl Turner Treasurer 11/04/2022
Eleanor Trueman Trustee 1/12/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/02/2025 NOC015
25/06/2024 NOC013
20/07/2023 NOC011
7/03/2022 NOC009
3/05/2020 NOC006
24/11/2019 NOC004
8/09/2019 NOC003
23/08/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.