Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Seed the Change | He Kākano Hāpai
CC55476
9429046527363
Registered

Registration details

12/01/2018
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12-180
Beckenham
Christchurch
8242
Suite 14D
Jerningham Apartments
Oriental Bay
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0210534150
@seedthechangenz
@seedthechangenz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Seeding joyful change for a world in balance through seed grants, nuturing early stage projects and aligning our balance sheet assets to our purpose.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Other (please state)

(Environmental, equitable and joyous intiatives)

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2018 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 1/10/2024 $492,491 $416,643 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 29/09/2023 $543,430 $125,914 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $415,339 $198,776 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 24/09/2021 $215,791 $230,575 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/11/2020 19/10/2020 $224,180 $160,618 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 14/08/2019 $459,588 $84,531 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rose Challies Trustee 13/12/2019
Anake Angus Murray Goodall Chair 11/10/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kathleen Sally Frykberg Trustee 16/09/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/09/2021 NOC005
20/12/2019 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.