Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Loneliness New Zealand Charitable Trust
Loneliness NZ
CC55511
9429046744579
Registered

Registration details

24/04/2018
March 31

Address for service

30A Bell Road
Remuera
Auckland
1050

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purposes of the Trust are (a) to promote public health and social inclusion by supporting those already experiencing loneliness in their lives; (b) to advance education by upskilling people in ways to prevent themselves and/or others becoming lonely; (c) to increase wellbeing and life satisfaction of our population by giving New Zealand a focus on conquering loneliness.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health

General public

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

We are operating from a base in Auckland and are actively intent on serving New Zealanders nationally. Our trust deed states that we must have between two and eight Trustees. We currently have three Trustees that constitute our governance board, including one executive position: chairperson. We are not affiliated with any other organisation. In addition our trust deed allows for us to have Advisers to the Trustees which will be appointed as needed to serve the best interest of the trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 16/09/2024 $1,589 $1,859 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 4/04/2023 $4,524 $4,495 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 2/09/2022 $4,755 $7,532 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 27/07/2021 $8,566 $5,994 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/12/2020 9/12/2020 $1,316 $667 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 26/09/2019 $4,865 $5,271 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Catherine Elizabeth Comber Trustee 20/04/2018
Spencer Charles Scoular Trustee 20/04/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Fiona Sykes Trustee 31/12/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/05/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.