pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Walsh Aviation Support Society Incorporated
CC55719
9429045938542
Registered

Registration details

4/04/2018
September 30

Address for service

19 Valhalla Drive
Richmond
7020

Charity's other details

021 620267


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the organisation is to advance education by supporting youth aviation students. The organisation exists to financially support WALSH(Walsh Scout Memorial Flying School) by raising funds towards the purchase and maintenance of equipment for the school. WALSH is primarily an educational institution, which runs aviation courses annually which act as a vehicle to teach important life skills, such as leadership and communication, and promotes personal growth, which results in a wider benefit to the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Education / training / research

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society. Our rules set out that we must have a Managing Committee comprising of a President, Secretary and a Treasurer, as well as three additional committee members. At this stage, we have a Chairman, a Secretary and Treasurer, as well as three additional committee members. Our registered office is located in Nelson. The courses are held by WALSH at the Matamata airfield. WALSH is affiliated with Scouts NZ.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2022 23/02/2022 $393,822 $32,710
31/03/2021 16/02/2021 $95,253 $19,239
31/03/2020 2/02/2020 $102,135 $8,170
31/03/2019 17/02/2019 $90,006 $6,195

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nicoholas Vanderschantz Secretary 19/01/2019
David William Jupp Committee Member 20/01/2017
John Henry Staples Hamilton Committee Member 20/01/2017
Mark Gerard Woodhouse Chairman 20/01/2017
Stephen John Scott Committee Member 20/01/2017
Steven Paul Bodt Treasurer 20/01/2017

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents