Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Weave Together
CC55730
9429046741592
Registered

Registration details

14/05/2018
March 31

Address for service

Floor 1
43 Princes Street
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

0800100962


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To benefit the community by supporting and assisting charitable organisations in the Otago region: *To ensure charities are organised and managed so they can operate as efficiently and effectively as possible, complete their charitable activities and realize their charitable aims. *Weave Together support by providing bookkeeping, payroll, office administration services, strategic planning and business solutions and other ancillary services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Promotion of volunteering

Other charities

Voluntary bodies other than charities

Entity Structure

Weave Together operates as an employee run social enterprise. *Income is from fee-for-service work. Income not spent on wages, business costs and prudent reserves is added to Trust Assets. On winding up remaining Trust Assets will be distributed to NZ Charities. *Governance is by a Board of Trustees. Trustees must be employees of the Trust. *Weave Together employ additional staff and contractors as needed to complete the fee-for-service work. Not all employees will be Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 25/09/2023 $269,880 $273,303 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 20/09/2022 $229,558 $275,066 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 2/06/2021 $267,255 $224,871 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 17/08/2020 $182,457 $177,913 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 23/09/2019 $175,815 $164,029 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Annette Harrex Partner 23/04/2018
Bronwyn Boon Partner 23/04/2018
Rob Tigeir Partner 23/04/2018

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.