Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Animal Evac New Zealand Trust Board
Animal Evac NZ
CC55754
9429046802262
Registered

Registration details

5/29/2018
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 216
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
5 Bennett Grove
Newlands
Wellington
6037

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/AnimalEvacNZ/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Formed in 2018, following the devastating Edgecumbe flood the year prior that saw over 1,000 animals left behind in need of rescue, Animal Evac New Zealand (Kararehe Whakawatea) is a charity comprised of a grass roots network of volunteers nation-wide who are trained in animal disaster response to support civil defence and emergency services during times of need, to ensure all animals are protected from harm.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Care / protection of animals

Emergency / disaster relief, Promotion of volunteering

Animals

General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust Board established under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
3/31/2024 9/30/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
3/31/2023 9/30/2023 9/29/2023 $83,341 $20,600 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2022 9/30/2022 9/30/2022 $38,804 $50,064 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2021 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 $35,103 $41,135 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2020 9/30/2020 9/29/2020 $111,469 $77,186 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2019 9/30/2019 7/16/2019 $37,676 $29,325 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Pinky Shah Secretary 9/11/2022
Stephen Glassey Patron 1/17/2021
Anne-Marie Lynch Treasurer 11/12/2019
Mark James Anderson Trustee 3/10/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tony Chauncey Philippe Sutorius Chairperson 7/9/2023
Julia Margaret Vahry Trustee 6/11/2023
Richard Graham Briggs Trustee 6/11/2023
Casandra Mealey Trustee 6/8/2022
Cathryn Sarah Bridge Deputy Chair 5/23/2022
Evan Michael Collins Trustee 4/14/2022
Julia Wells Trustee 10/1/2020
Clare Justine Marks Secretary and Trustee 1/26/2020
Bryce James Wigodsky Trustee 1/15/2020
Stephen Glassey Chairman 11/12/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/19/2023 NOC020
12/4/2022 NOC019
12/1/2022 NOC018
9/3/2022 NOC016
1/16/2021 NOC014
1/16/2021 NOC013
12/3/2019 NOC010
11/26/2019 NOC009
10/17/2019 NOC008
9/23/2019 NOC007
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.