pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ehlers-Danlos Society New Zealand Incorporated
Ehlers-Danlos Syndromes New Zealand
CC55826
9429046799357
Registered

Registration details

12/06/2018
March 31

Address for service

Unit 2
21 Alexander Avenue
Torbay
Auckland
0630

Charity's other details

0211574626
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/EDSNewZealand/
www.facebook.com/groups/LooselySpeakingNZ/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to improve the wellbeing of those with Ehlers-Danlos Syndromes/Hypermobility Spectrum Disorders in Aotearoa New Zealand by raising awareness, improving knowledge by health professionals and providing support to patients.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Education / training / research, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

General public

Entity Structure

Ehlers-Danlos Syndromes New Zealand’s Leadership consists of the President and the Treasurer. The Secretary position, that was part of the structure in 2019 has not been recruited for within 2020 financial year, focus as a Society was best focused elsewhere. This position will be reintroduced within the 2021 year. Our Committee size increased to 7 in August 2019, decreased by one in Jan 2020, and plans to increase the committee size again within 2021.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 13/10/2022 $4,928 $5,321
30/11/2021 25/11/2021 $1,975 $4,208
30/09/2020 14/09/2020 $4,988 $1,978
30/09/2019 9/09/2019 $50 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sarah Teare Committee Member 11/08/2022
Nikita (Nikki) Van Dyk Committee Member 1/06/2022
Wendy Fairs Committee Member 1/09/2021
Tara Apperley Treasurer/Committee Member 11/06/2020
Jennifer Saunders Secretary/Committee Member 28/04/2020
Kelly Jessie Zane McQuinlan President 1/05/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Fleur Bourgeois Committee Member 12/02/2022
Peter Bourgeois Committee Member 12/02/2022
Alli Jackson Committee Member 1/01/2022
Sharleen Bigham Committee Member 4/10/2021
Angela Desmarais Committee Member 14/04/2021
Pamela Buckingham Committee Member 9/09/2020
Lisa Preston Treasurer/Officer 20/05/2020
Natalie Dudley Committee Member 11/03/2020
Stephanie Aston Secratary 15/07/2019
Ben Cremer Officer 1/07/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/09/2022 NOC010
23/09/2022 NOC009
10/11/2021 NOC006
10/11/2021 NOC005
10/10/2019 NOC003
9/09/2019 NOC002

Charity Documents