Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ovarian Cancer Foundation New Zealand
Cure Our Ovarian Cancer, Ovarian Cancer NZ
CC55925
9429046845467
Registered

Registration details

31/07/2018
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Cure My Ovarian Cancer (Low Grade Serous) Charitable Trust 14/11/2018
Cure Our Ovarian Cancer (Low Grade Serous) Charitable Trust 5/12/2018
Ovarian Cancer Foundation New Zealand 13/12/2023

Address for service

27B Dovedale Avenue
Ilam
Christchurch
8041

Charity's other details

facebook.com/ovariancancerfoundationnz

Oceania

Australia

North America

Canada, United States

Europe

United Kingdom


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

OCFNZ's purpose is to improve ovarian cancer care in New Zealand by funding transformational research, advocating with women for better funding and treatment options, providing support to women and raising awareness of ovarian cancer.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Fund-raising

Health

Other (please state)

(People affected by ovarian cancer)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 15/11/2024 14/11/2024 $441,295 $358,026 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/11/2023 29/11/2023 $320,741 $139,767 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/11/2022 1/12/2022 $110,313 $70,567 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/10/2021 26/10/2021 $172,423 $85,248 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/10/2020 2/11/2020 $160,759 $106,499 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 31/10/2019 $88,493 $3,479 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Madison Chamberlain Trustee 22/12/2024
Benjamin Conway Russell Trustee 27/09/2022
Alana Allan Trustee 20/12/2021
Alicia Didsbury Trustee 20/12/2021
Jane Mary Ludemann Trustee 31/05/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Liz Pennington Trustee 8/04/2025
Elspeth Joan Ludemann Trustee 20/12/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/04/2025 NOC020
14/03/2025 NOC019
14/03/2025 NOC018
13/03/2025 NOC017
26/02/2024 NOC015
11/01/2024 NOC014
30/09/2022 NOC011
30/09/2022 NOC010
11/04/2022 NOC009
26/10/2021 NOC007
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.