pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


OpenLaw NZ Limited
CC55967
9429046918826
Registered

Registration details

24/07/2018
March 31

Address for service

9 Hunt Street
Whangarei
0110

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To educate the public about law by: a. enhancing and promoting online access to Legal Information; b. maximising the availability and accessibility of online Legal Information to the public; c. enhancing the utility of public Legal Information through the provision, development and maintenance of an open legal data platform; and To increase public understanding of law in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

OpenLaw NZ is company incorporated under the Companies Act 1993. The company has two directors and engages contractors to help develop the OpenLaw NZ platform. We operate online-only, at www.openlaw.nz and provide related open source, and open access legal software from there.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 18/09/2021 $15,000 $14,534
30/09/2020 27/09/2020 $35,004 $16,605
30/09/2019 27/06/2019 $615 $928

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrew John Easterbrook Director 23/07/2018
William Hugh Parry Director 23/07/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/01/2022 NOC005
6/05/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents