Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Berean Insights Trust
CC56264
9429047044999
Registered

Registration details

17/10/2018
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 276005
Manukau City
Manukau
Auckland
2241
6th Floor Laidlaw Buiding
20 Amersham Way
Manukau
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

09 928 0800
Ian_Vail
@ianvail

South America

Brazil

North America

United States

Asia

Indonesia


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Objects of the Trust is to create a fund to be used for charitable purposes to educate and train people in scripture use and to collaborate with other organisations and individuals to achieve holistic community development

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Religious activities

Education / training / research

Religious groups

General public

Entity Structure

The entity holds funds received for the charitable purpose above and expends these resources accordingly. The Trust is governed by five Trustees who meet as often as necessary to ensure the objectives are met.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 19/08/2023 $38,077 $32,767 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 28/09/2022 $16,338 $24,801 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 25/09/2021 $41,371 $7,668 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $45,559 $24,387 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 27/09/2019 $1,796 $2,353 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Frederick Wayne Freeman Trustee and Treasurer 15/10/2018
Ian Warren Vail Trustee and Chairman 12/09/2018
Joshua David Moore Trustee 12/09/2018
Stephen Geoffrey Bennett Trustee 12/09/2018
Tania Jane Vail Trustee and Secretary 12/09/2018

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.