Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Taranaki R.A.T.S (Riders Against Teenage Suicide)
CC56277
9429051964511
Registered

Registration details

6/11/2018
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Taranaki R.A.T.S 6/11/2018
Taranaki R.A.T.S. (Riders Against Teenage Suicide) 8/09/2020
Taranaki R.A.T.S (Riders Against Teenage Suicide) 26/04/2022

Address for service

6 Brecon Road
Stratford
4332

Charity's other details

0212447724
https://www.facebook.com/groups/609982429478874/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Taranaki R.A.T.S (Riders Against Teenage Suicide) Our objective is to advance the education of the general public in the Taranaki Region around Suicide Awareness, Prevention and Postvention

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Health

General public

Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 21/09/2024 $11,809 $12,681 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 15/09/2023 $4,039 $2,900 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 28/07/2022 $5,851 $5,325 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $5,189 $3,605 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 9/09/2020 $2,364 $2,994 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 21/09/2019 $4,317 $3,366 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gary Charles Anderson Trustee 21/07/2022
Amber Lee Williams Trustee 30/07/2021
Nigel Kenneth Alexander Scott Trustee 12/10/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Donna Lea Scott Trustee 15/06/2023
Stephen John Brian Dix Trustee 17/05/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/04/2023 NOC008
10/09/2020 NOC005
31/05/2019 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.