Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Black Ribbon New Zealand Trust
CC56457
9429046354174
Registered

Registration details

12/11/2018
July 31

Address for service

10 Oroua Street
Te Puke
3119

Charity's other details

www.facebook.com/BlackRibbonNZ
www.twitter.com/BlackRibbonNZ


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust is to advocate the awareness of domestic violence insofar as it is non-discriminatory in terms of any of the prohibited grounds of discrimination pursuant to Section 21 of the Human Rights Act 1993. The Trust does this by operating internet-based social media campaigns, supporting entities with aligned purposes, undertaking local fundraising and awareness campaigns, and operating an online directory of services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Health

General public

Entity Structure

Black Ribbon New Zealand Trust comprises of a Governance Board made up of no less than three and no more than seven Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
7/31/2023 5/31/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
7/31/2022 1/31/2023 1/30/2023 $1,235 $3,120 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
7/31/2021 1/31/2022 1/20/2022 $4,353 $1,069 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
7/31/2020 1/31/2021 11/17/2020 $473 $3,003 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
7/31/2019 1/31/2020 1/22/2020 $4,476 $1,038 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Wayne Burrows Chairperson 3/16/2018
Jan-Maria Eustace Secretary 1/29/2018
Chris Munday Trustee 8/22/2017
Rachel Rolston Treasurer 8/22/2017
Steven Greig Trustee 8/22/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Brendon Sargent Trustee 8/9/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/3/2022 NOC006
11/6/2020 NOC003
10/7/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.