Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Whanganui Māori Reservation Trust
Whanganui Bay Māori Reservation Trust
CC56475
N/A
Registered

Registration details

13/11/2018
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Whanganui Bay Maori Reservation Trust 13/11/2018
Whanganui Māori Reservation Trust 27/08/2020

Address for service

38 O'Donn Avenue
Beach Haven
Auckland
0626
5155 Western Bay Road
State Highway 32
Waihaha
3381

Charity's other details

+64223134312
https://www.facebook.com/groups/824396062065887/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Marae, Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust’s objectives are set out in the Trust Order on 25 June 1969 which vested 20 acres (8.1949 hectares) adding an additional 115.6389 hectares to this Reservation in 25 March 1991 to.. - occupy & manage a farm - plant trees - subdivide - grant leases - Upkeep mtc or developmt - tourism, sports, rec & community - borrow money on security of land - distribute monies - investment - distribute to owners

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research, Marae on reservation land, Arts / culture / heritage

Other (please state)

(Descendants of Ngati Te Maunga Hapu o Ngati Tuwharetoa iwi.)

Entity Structure

Māori Reservation Trust under Te Ture Whenua Maori Act. There are currently 13 trustees who constitute the governance board. The Trust relies on volunteer trustees and others to govern and operate.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 28/02/2025 25/02/2025 $44,183 $16,951 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 8/11/2023 $27,548 $26,966 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 1/08/2022 $18,768 $10,032 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 22/07/2021 $16,144 $21,534 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 15/09/2020 $13,986 $20,116 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 28/11/2019 $16,491 $30,169 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jacinta Heeni Peretini Treasurer 20/06/2023
Meri Rangiwahia Blakey Secretary 26/03/2023
Jovita Whenuakura Floyd Trustee 16/03/2020
Manu McLeod Trustee 16/03/2020
Pauline Casey Thompson Trustee 16/03/2020
Regina Iriaka Hepi Trustee 16/03/2020
Warwick Hepi Chairman 16/03/2020
Marlon Te Hinarakau Hepi Trustee 1/07/2017
Rosette Moerangi Rakaupai Trustee 1/07/2004

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Veronica Josephine Pirihira Hunapo Social Development/Finance 30/10/2023
Joanne TeHuia Co-Chair/Governance/Finance 31/10/2022
Huitao Te Kohika Rakaupai Treasurer/Environment 23/02/2022
Mereana Maryanne Hepi Resigned 2019 6/05/2020
Blandina Te Wikitoria Diamond Resigned 2019 12/08/2019
Mandie Brown Resigned 2019 10/11/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/02/2024 NOC021
5/02/2024 NOC020
12/12/2023 NOC019
16/07/2023 NOC017
16/07/2023 NOC016
3/08/2022 NOC015
3/08/2022 NOC014
15/05/2021 NOC011
15/05/2021 NOC010
19/03/2021 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.