Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ruamahanga Restoration Trust
CC56547
9429047175624
Registered

Registration details

22/01/2019
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 936
Masterton
5840

Charity's other details

0211961984
n/a
https://www.facebook.com/RRTrust
https://twitter.com/RuamahangaT
https://www.instagram.com/ruamahanga_restoration_trust/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The primary purpose of the Trust is to create educational, hands-on environmental conservation projects that engage with schools, landowners, and rural communities within the Wairarapa with the aim to regenerate native bush, restore wetland feeder streams and create native bird corridors along the length and breadth of Ruamahanga River and its many tributaries..

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides support and resources for schools and rural communities)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The Trust is administered by a Board of Trustees who are accountable to, and elected by, members of the Trust. The Board shall consist of not less than three nor more than ten members. Currently, there are three trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2019 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2022 7/10/2022 10/10/2022 $100,681 $33,123 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/10/2021 29/10/2021 $10,102 $16,262 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 23/09/2020 $9,001 $3,070 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Campbell Hew Gordon McLean Trustee 6/11/2018
Christopher John Morrison Trustee 6/11/2018
Michael Reginald Birch Trustee 6/11/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Melissa Clark-Reynolds Trustee 30/04/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/05/2023 NOC008
30/09/2022 NOC006
21/12/2021 NOC005
5/02/2021 NOC003
17/04/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.