Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Every Body Is a Treasure
CC56586
9429046351555
Registered

Registration details

3/10/2018
March 31

Address for service

191 Plateau Road
Te Marua
Upper Hutt
5018

Charity's other details

04-2107776
https://www.facebook.com/everybodyisatreasure/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Vision: Community-led reduction to the collective trauma load. Every Body is Treasured (including Papatuanuku). Our Mission: Community wellbeing through Innovative, creative and environmental youth work. Mindful, body(somatic), environmental-based wellbeing programs. Weaving people together through creative collaboration and skill building. Co-designing and enhancing trauma-informed care of youth. Co-create community-led well-being programs that are early intervention instead of an ambulance at the bottom-of-the-cliff responses.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Community development

Health, Arts / culture / heritage

Other (please state)

(Women and youth)

Entity Structure

We have a head office based in Upper Hutt. Our trust deed states that we must have a minimum of three Trustees. We currently have five Trustees that constitute our governance board, including three executive positions: CEO, treasurer and secretary.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Heartivists Studios Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 13/10/2023 9/10/2023 $179,255 $252,181 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 8/11/2022 7/11/2022 $193,929 $129,026 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $137,850 $99,573 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 14/09/2020 $68,242 $40,422 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 30/10/2019 $40,728 $28,457 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Faithe Hinehou Hanrahan Trustee 17/03/2024
Penny Aspin Trustee 19/06/2019
Craig David Thompson Trustee 11/09/2017
Mandi Lynn Trustee 11/09/2017
Stella Barbara Mackey Trustee 11/09/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/03/2024 NOC010
17/10/2023 NOC008
11/11/2020 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.