Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Brain Tumour Support Trust New Zealand
Brain Tumour Support NZ
CC56933
9429047714182
Registered

Registration details

25/06/2019
March 31

Address for service

4 Tennyson Road
Enderley
Hamilton
3214

Charity's other details

0272923337
https://www.facebook.com/braintumoursupportNZ/
@btsupportnz
https://www.instagram.com/braintumoursupportnz/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We aspire to be a national brain tumour patient organisation, providing information, support and guidance to patients, their carers and whānau. We aim to advocate for the best treatments, care and support for patients, so they can have the best possible outcomes and quality of life throughout their brain tumour journey, from initial diagnosis and beyond.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides support/advice/information/advocacy)

Health

Social services, People with disabilities

General public

People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 9/09/2024 $132,990 $128,717 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 28/09/2023 $122,325 $118,461 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 19/09/2022 $93,473 $64,125 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 13/07/2021 $84,040 $51,076 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 16/08/2020 $17,397 $2,665 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sarah Elizabeth Verran Chief Executive 22/01/2024
Tania Conroy Anstiss Trustee 14/11/2023
Sarah Frances Gibb Trustee 10/07/2021
Moira Grace Coatsworth Trustee 8/04/2021
Timothy Hugh Franklin Trustee 8/04/2021
Christopher Ward Tse Chairperson 23/05/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Cedric Brydon Treasurer 11/02/2025
Shelina Joy McManus Secretary 12/04/2024
Mandy Bathan Trustee 31/01/2024
Marie Therese Waterhouse Secretary 5/05/2023
Gavin John Starling Trustee 16/02/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/04/2024 NOC016
16/04/2024 NOC015
25/03/2024 NOC014
6/11/2023 NOC013
22/03/2023 NOC011
7/09/2021 NOC009
28/07/2021 NOC008
15/07/2021 NOC007
15/07/2021 NOC006
10/05/2021 NOC004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.