pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Gender Minorities Aotearoa
Aunty Dana's Op Shop, The Gender Centre, Transgender NZ, Takataapui Trust
CC57053
N/A
Registered

Registration details

23/07/2019
March 31

Address for service

130 Riddiford Street
Newtown
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

02040492568


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Gender Minorities Aotearoa aims to facilitate health and well-being for takataapui, transgender, and intersex populations, as defined by The World Health Organisation, Te Pae Mahutonga, and The Ottawa Charter. Our vision is for all takataapui, transgender, and intersex people to be empowered by a full range of choices across all aspects of their lives, and to be able to participate fully in society.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Employment, Fund-raising

Other (please state)

(Transgender, intersex, and irawhiti takatāpui people, their whānau, partners, friends and supporters)

Entity Structure

GMA has a Board of Trustees, including 4 executive positions: chair, treasurer, secretary, and National Coordinator, though one individual may hold more than one position. These executives are the Trustees named in The Rules. The Board may have other non-Trustee members as The Board shall decide. GMA has a National Coordinator or Executive Director overseeing Operations. Our national office is in the capital city Wellington.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 July 2019 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 9/07/2021 $114,130 $142,312
30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $152,229 $132,641
31/01/2020 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Restricted

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/09/2020 NOC002

Charity Documents