Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Trust Investments – International Bond Fund
CC57228
N/A
Deregistered
22/06/2020

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Trust Investments – International Bond Fund at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

14/11/2019
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 22/06/2020 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 14/11/2019

Address for service

Level 4
123 Cartlon Gore Road
Newmarket
Auckland
1023

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Fund is an investment vehicle for registered charities to generate income for their charitable activities. The Master Trust Deed which governs the Fund requires the Fund to be carried on solely and exclusively for Charitable Purposes, including every purpose within New Zealand which in accordance with the Income Tax Act 2007 is charitable, whether such purpose relates to the relief of poverty, the advancement of education or religion, or any other matter beneficial to the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Fund-raising

Other charities

Entity Structure

The Fund is a group investment fund established under Part II of the Trustee Companies Act 1967 and a managed investment scheme registered under the Financial Markets Conduct Act 2013. The only persons who are permitted to hold units in the Fund are trustees in trust exclusively for charitable purposes within New Zealand, and societies or institutions established or maintained exclusively for such purposes and not carried on for the private pecuniary profit of any individual.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 December 2019 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
The New Zealand Guardian Trust Company Limited Supervisor 18/01/2005
Trust Investments Management Limited as trustee of the Trust Investments Management Charitable Trust Manager 18/01/2005

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.