Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Waihi Beach Menz Shed Charitable Trust
Waihi Beach Menzshed
CC57304
N/A
Registered

Registration details

22/08/2019
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Waihi Beach Community Development Charitable Trust 22/08/2019
Waihi Beach Menz Shed Charitable Trust 18/05/2023

Address for service

106B Beach Road
Waihi Beach
3611

Charity's other details

027 592 4304


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To benefit the Waihi Beach community by: (a) Promoting, acquiring and/or developing facilities beneficial to the Waihi Beach community; (b) Raising funds for distribution to other charitable organisations supporting the Waihi Beach community; (c) Promoting and developing a “Menz Shed” facility to: (i)Provide a place for men to meet, socialize and engage in projects that benefit themselves and the wider community; (ii) Support the social interaction and well being of men.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Education / training / research, Sport / recreation

General public

Older people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 29/08/2024 $23,007 $19,391 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 21/08/2023 $33,768 $8,630 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 22/06/2022 $86,875 $2,447 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 9/09/2021 $49,430 $31 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 16/09/2020 $8,585 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Christopher Henry Rex Pilkington Secretary/Treasurer/Trustee 1/04/2023
Graham John Shirley Trustee 1/04/2023
John Ross Lockwood Chairperson/Trustee 1/04/2023
Michael Samuel Bonnici Trustee 1/04/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Robert Walter Firth Secretary 6/06/2023
Donald Eon Fraser Trustee 29/05/2023
Brian Donald Baynes Trustee 30/03/2023
Thomas Wallace Trustee 30/03/2023
William Donald Oliver Trustee 7/11/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/06/2023 NOC009
31/05/2023 NOC008
25/05/2023 NOC007
31/10/2021 NOC005
31/10/2021 NOC004

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.