pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Diverse Church New Zealand Trust
Awaken Conference
CC57366
N/A
Registered

Registration details

28/09/2019
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 85090
Harris Road
Mount Wellington
Auckland
1545
2C Handley Avenue
Narrow Neck
Auckland
0624

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust has been established to promote, support and/or undertake the organisation of religious and cultural events and activities in NZ for the LGBTQIF+ community, with the distinct aim of advancing inclusive religion, with particular focus on the teachings of Jesus Christ and the Kingdom of God as outlined in the gospels. The Trust also aims to encourage and develop leadership skills within the LGBTQIF+ community, particularly in young people.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Religious activities

General public

Entity Structure

Trust Deed

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 13/02/2022 $13,744 $11,027
30/09/2020 13/02/2022 $2,000 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Craig Watson Trustee 18/09/2019
David Allis Trustee 18/09/2019
Geremy Hema Trustee 18/09/2019
John Deyell Trustee 18/09/2019
Neill Ballantyne Trustee 18/09/2019

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents