Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


NZ Alopecia
CC57376
9429048973991
Registered

Registration details

2/09/2019
June 30

Address for service

22A Briarmont Street
Avondale
Christchurch
8061

Charity's other details

021 027 11501
https://www.facebook.com/NZAlopecia


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To assist people suffering hair loss with support and education. Educating the public on the condition alopecia.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

Nothing binding currently, but would like to work with Doctors with pamphlets to be handed out to patients along with hair clinics. Also to have counseling available with funding for wigs etc.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 16/11/2023 $8,704 $497 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 30/06/2023 6/11/2023 $1,785 $352 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2022 $2,470 $294 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 8/06/2021 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lara Jane McMurray Committee 7/02/2024
Amanda Calvert Committee 29/11/2023
Judy Woolley Committee 29/11/2023
Justin Calvert Committee 29/11/2023
Louise Elizabeth Bailey Secretary 29/11/2023
Michelle Prendiville Committee 29/11/2023
Paul Eamon Jackson Treasurer 4/04/2021
Rebecca Ridgen Vice President 4/04/2021
Amanda Margaret Munn Committee 28/04/2018
Nicola Jane Topping Chairperson 28/04/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christopher Toloza Lagula Treasurer 27/09/2023
Susan Joy Davis Treasurer 4/04/2021
Virginia Mary Emmett Secretary 4/04/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/01/2024 NOC009
9/11/2023 NOC007
28/08/2023 NOC006
7/06/2021 NOC003
6/06/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.