Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Nature School Dunedin
CC57391
9429047737235
Registered

Registration details

29/10/2019
June 30

Address for service

200 Doctors Point Road
RD 2
Waitati
9085

Charity's other details

0273735533
https://www.facebook.com/natureschooldunedin/
https://www.dunedinnature.school/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Teaching children social, technical and life skills through hands-on experiences and play out in the natural world; and giving them opportunities to achieve personal goals and gain resilience.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Health, Environment / conservation, Care / protection of animals

Children / young people

Animals, General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 22/12/2024 $49,135 $53,419 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 17/12/2023 $92,390 $83,182 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 30/11/2022 $84,775 $86,421 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 22/12/2021 $47,225 $45,065 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 30/12/2020 $11,578 $6,234 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Elizabeth Potter Trustee 4/10/2019
Geoffrey Markby Trustee 4/10/2019
Jane Chartres Trustee 4/10/2019
Laurence Potter Trustee 4/10/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Raymond Huber Trustee 25/11/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/03/2023 NOC006
2/12/2022 NOC005
4/06/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.