Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


King Country Education Trust
CC57408
9429047209558
Registered

Registration details

30/01/2020
March 31

Address for service

6 Nelvin Avenue
RD 2
Manunui
Taumarunui
3992

Charity's other details

0272779081


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

3.1.1 To research, conceptualise & educate the public on the King Country region; 3.1.2 To develop, collate & archive resources for the above-stated purpose; 3.1.3 To teach, promote and support recipients by a variety of means; print, media & digital; 3.1.4 To conduct its purposes with a particular focus on New Zealand Maori & Caucasian historical events of the King Country region;

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

KCET has a Board of three trustees operating under a Trust Deed

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2020 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 20/11/2022 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/10/2021 1/02/2022 $0 $1 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 1/02/2022 $781 $778 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bevan Stuart Cooke Trustee 16/09/2021
Gary Paul Fitzpatrick Trustee 28/01/2020
Ronal Leslie Cooke Trustee 14/12/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dennis Smith Trustee, CEO 22/07/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/01/2022 NOC002
5/03/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.