Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Pixies Animal Rescue Trust
CC57423
9429047993822
Deregistered
19/01/2022

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$3,000
$55,000

The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:

  • Transferred to another Organisation that is not a registered Charity

    Organisation:

    Chained Dog awareness NZ


Below are details of Pixies Animal Rescue Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

4/12/2019
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 19/01/2022 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 4/12/2019

Address for service

PO Box 300457
Albany
Auckland
0752

Charity's other details

+6402102744258
Pixies animal rescue trust


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To plan, establish, maintain and operate a rescue and rehoming programme for the welfare, care and protection of animals. Providing shelter, food and veterinary care to animals that have been neglected, abused or that are unwanted, or other such activities as the Trustees shall deem desirable, for the benefit of the community/group/organisations and public in general.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Care / protection of animals

Animals

Older people, General public

Entity Structure

Pixies Animal Rescue Trust will operate as a Charitable Trust dedicated to the rescue and re homing of abused, neglected and unwanted animals. A board of trustees (as indicated in the charities deed of trust) will be established and a CEO appointed once the charity has been registered. The CEO will manage the day to day running of the organisation with additional help from up to three paid animal attendants. Volunteers will also be able to support the activities of the Trust as required.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 8/10/2020 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dirk Jacobus Wolmarans Trustee 23/10/2019
Paula Joy Wheeler Trustee 23/10/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Caroline Colandrea CEO/Founder 6/10/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/02/2020 NOC004
10/02/2020 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.