Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Remembrance Army Charitable Trust
CC57472
N/A
Registered

Registration details

1/10/2019
June 30

Address for service

9A Richard Street
Titahi Bay
Porirua
5022

Charity's other details

027 2727507
NZ Remembrance Army


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To foster the cleaning and restoration of all service graves and memorials within New Zealand and tell the stories of service

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Community development

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

We have a national team made up of the trustees and then regional coordinators across New Zealand. We coordinate grave restoration with local coordinators for Military graves.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 24/09/2024 $84,251 $112,567 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 1/09/2023 $84,251 $100,228 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 8/09/2022 $112,589 $73,201 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 25/08/2021 $28,213 $16,834 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 1/09/2020 $14,390 $3,949 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
= Balance Date Change
- This annual return will cover the financial period between 1 April 2021- 30 June 2022 (15 months) due to a balance date change.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Karen Lee Adams Trustee 22/04/2022
Mark Edward Brewer Trustee 22/04/2022
Simon John Strombom Trustee 1/07/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Heather Jean Roy Trustee 1/01/2023
Andrew Colin Gregory Trustee 22/04/2022
Benjamin Morgan Stallworthy Trustee 22/04/2022
Shane Micheal Wratt Trustee 22/04/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/05/2022 NOC005
9/05/2022 NOC004
9/05/2022 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.