pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2020 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Friends of Regional Parks (Auckland) Incorporated
FOR Parks
CC57573
9429043235735
Registered

Registration details

21/02/2020
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 60114
Titirangi
Auckland
0642
137 Cornwallis Road
Cornwallis
Auckland
0604

Charity's other details

0212036428
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/FORparks


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Friends of Regional Parks (Auckland) Inc is a society whose purpose is to help the potential of Auckland's Regional Parks network to be most fully realised and maintained.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Other (please state)

(Recreation and conservation)

General public

Entity Structure

Friends of Regional Parks (Auckland) Inc is a not-for-profit incorporated society with an executive committee elected on an annual basis from financial members of the society.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 29/08/2023 $15,219 $850
30/09/2022 24/06/2022 $1,510 $209
30/09/2021 20/05/2021 $2,140 $7,082
30/09/2020 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Antony John Walton Secretary 5/12/2022
Suzanne Mary Hill Treasurer 22/06/2022
Simon Stanley Milne Committee Member 19/04/2021
Bruce Tubb Committee Member 15/04/2019
Nicholas William Waipara Communications 15/04/2019
Bronwen Joy Turner Chair 12/06/2017
Christopher Howden Deputy Chair 9/09/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kelly Jane O'Donnell Secretary/Administration 24/03/2023
Ralph Edward Lyon Committee Member 14/11/2022
Robert John Woolf Committee member 5/08/2022
William Andrew Burrill Patron 23/07/2022
Salvatore Reito Committee Member 25/03/2022
Fiona Ann Ryder Committee Member 19/04/2021
Robert Wyndham Mitchell Deputy Chair 19/04/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/12/2022 NOC016
6/12/2022 NOC014
14/11/2022 NOC012
13/11/2022 NOC011
22/09/2022 NOC010
17/08/2022 NOC009
23/07/2022 NOC008
25/03/2022 NOC006
20/09/2021 NOC004
20/05/2021 NOC003

Charity Documents